31/10/1948 |
St. Rollox Works |
No. 54767 Clan Mackinnon and a 'Wick & Lybster' tank No. 15053 arrived at the Works on 12/10 and 19/10 respectively, both for attention to their boilers; 15053 still retains the H.R. building plates. Locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here during October 1948 (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) were as follows; - with 8' numerals and 10' 'British Railways' Nos. 40598 (3810) 12; 45017 (9530) 10; 45163 (9267) 26; 45309 (9719) 20; 45364 (9185) 4; 45463 (9725) 18; 45481 (9281) 31; 45485 (9831) 4; 45489 (9269) 7; 45583 (9030) 14; 45728 (9025) 22; - with 8' numerals and 8' 'British Railways' Nos. 41128 29; 42746 (4345) 13; 42832 (4167) 22; 42836 (4213) 20; 43883 (2976) 13; 43996 (3085) 27; 54457 (6041) 27; 54505 (6039) 15; 57344 (6014) 20; 57456 (1343) 25; 57697 (1873) 12; 57955 31; - with 8' numerals and 6' 'British Railways' Nos. 40150 15; 40185 28; 42209 31; 42400 6; 55124 11; 56169 13; - with 10' numerals and 10' 'British Railways' No. 54496 (6210) 13; - with 8' numerals and retaining L.M.S. on the tender No. 45053 (9127) 18. Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock and treated with a full paint schedule (tender number in brackets, followed by date to Varnish Shop) were as follows:-Nos. 57435 (1308) 30/9; 57581 (1662) 1/10; 56256 4/10; 56237 6/10; 57575 (6049) 11/10; 57622 (1703) 8/10; 56262 11/10; *55223 21/10; 57638 26/10; 57653 30/10; 56165 5/11. *Fully lined, as also was No. 55233, which was referred to last month. |
SLS/194812 |
09/07/1949 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 40187, 575, 614, 40670, 40914, 1138, 42416/18, 42751, 42830, 2875, 42912/14, 4011, 4198, 44234, 4881/86/99, 44900/31/77, 45008, 45120/55/60/65/66/70/92, 45423, 5432, 45452/61/89, 45577/84, 45643, 15141/89, 15211/37, 55356, 16162, 16247/75/95, 56359, 17282, 17411, 17554, 57619, 17625/67. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. |
SLS/194908 |
31/12/1949 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 40150, 1110, 42163, 2801, 42808/36, 44318, 44700/97, 44958/72, 45036/47, 45122/27/51/58/63/69, 45364/66, 45461/70/89, 45579, 45644/92, 45715, 47163, 14507, 55161, 15199, 15218, 55233, 15361, 56025. 16166, 56239, 16285/92, 16316. 56336/69, 17242, 57340, 17354/84, 57599, 17672. No. 45575 is to be the first locomotive painted in the new green livery at St. Rollox. It will be noticed that the Works' shunter-No. 56025- is under repair, which is being replaced temporarily by No. 16035, which is on loan. |
SLS/195002 |
31/03/1950 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 595, 612, 40907/11, 42208, 42415, 42738/44/57, 42805, 42916, 43973, 4183, 44801, 44956, 45085/86, 45100/16/17/56/61/64/68/92, 45356, 45458/75/80/83/89/99, 45646, 46121, 14443, 54460, 54649, 56153, 16230/33, 56240, 16241, 56263, 16288, 16322/30/47, 17265, 57272, 57311/35, 17410/44/46, 57566, 17628, 57652. |
SLS/195005 |
06/07/1961 |
St. Rollox Works (Works Yard ) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D3132, D3410, D3528, D5300/3/10/1, D6120/37. Works Yard : 42243, 45157, 45489/92, 57328, 57631, D6111. Steam Erecting Shop: 42690/3, 42804, 42913, 44724, 44820/98, 44920/55, 45047, 45118, 45687/96, 45727, 57617. Waiting Works : 42167, 42780, 44722. Ex-Works: D3279, 42882, 44954, 45083, 45126. |
SLS/196108 |