Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2967 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16373 Week
» 69389 Month
» 188916 Year
» 3215769 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5479 |
m/e |
08/1943 |
British Railways |
45479 |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
151 |
To Service |
During 08/1943 |
Withdrawal |
During 05/1964 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
63A |
Perth South |
4w/e |
27/08/1960 |
ALLOC |
60A |
Inverness |
2w/e |
04/11/1961 |
ALLOC |
67D |
Ardrossan |
5w/e |
12/05/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/06/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5479 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Inverness (32A) |
|
|
19/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45479 |
|
|
27/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
21/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
21/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45479 |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|