01/10/1949 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 40570/73, 40621, 40907, 909, 41177, 2688, 42689, 2695, 42699, 2800/50, 42906, 3922, 44193, 4792, 44924, 4957, 44979/98, 45008/11/49, 45119/20/25/56/61/76, 45213/66, 45361, 45459, 5473, 45644/46/93, 45714/15/32, 47540, 14451/83, 54506, 54648, 15139, 55359, 16163/73, 16326/56/70/73, 17240/85, 17311, 57372, 57604/19, 17671, 17950. (14451's built-up chimney now removed). |
SLS/194911 |
31/03/1963 |
Settle-Carlisle diversions (In steam) |
Settle-Carlisle trains have been running via Ingleton during March in the daytime; single line operation at Dent during the night. The 'Waverley' is expected to be resumed between Leeds and Edinburgh in April. |
SLS/196304 |
30/03/1963 |
Forfar MPD (In steam) |
On shed at Forfar on0th March, 1963: In steam 45473 (pilot), 44796/97, 44879, 45475, Stored 60522, 73107, 44257 (now cut up), 54486/89/93, 54500, 55263, 56347. |
SLS/196304 |
13/06/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) (In Erecting Shop) |
In Erecting Shop: 44705, 45047/53, 45136/78, 45365, 45473, D363, D3341, D3416, D3544, D3926, D5116, D5305/9, D8076. Awaiting works : 42880, 44796, 45423, D5366. Ex Works: 45360. Diesel Test House: D265, D6123. Works Shunters: D2736, D3005, D3279, D8070. Stored : D6100/1/2/6/7/14/7/20/4/5/7/30 and GSWR 0-6-0T (ex Hafod Colliery). |
SLS/196307 |
11/07/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 42124, 42259, 42780, 44705/787, 45365, 45473, D359, D3009, D3533, D3741, D5128, D6124, D8076. Waiting Works: 42196, 42274, 42699, 42735, 44701, 45178. D3563, D5356. Ex-Works: 42736, 45053, D6123. Diesel Test House: D361, D3557. Works Shunters: D3412/6. Stored: GSWR 0-6-0T, D6100/1/2/4/6/7/14/8/20/5/7/30. |
SLS/196308 |