|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | St Rollox Works | The following locomotives have been painted in the temporary B.R. livery, i.e. unlined black with plain white lettering (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date):-Nos. 615 (4458) 9/2; 642 (4340) 18/2; 666 (4339) 1/3; 914 (4014) 17/2; 938 (4457) 26/2; 1138 (3555) 24/2; 2736 (4170) 29/2; 2749 (3336) 26/2; 2914 (4272) 20/2; 4323 (3817) 20/2; 5012 (9064) 9/2; 5018 (9829) 20/2; 5081 (9069) 2/2; 5082 (9005) 4/2; 5117 (9179) 24/2; 5127 (9713) 10/2; 5359 (9599) 19/2; 5459 (9593) 27/2; 5575 (9023) 10/2; 8185 (9912) 5/2; 8303 (10030) 12/2; 14476 (6173) 16/2; 14487 (6179) 25/2; 14501 (6209) 11/2; 17269 (910) 16/2; 17600 (1681) 11/2 and 17666 (1747) 12/2. No. 17313 arrived in the shops ex the dump on 20/2 and was cut up on 23/2. The boiler (Class N34 No. 1161) is to be repaired and used again | SLS/194804 |
01/10/1949 | St. Rollox Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 40570/73, 40621, 40907, 909, 41177, 2688, 42689, 2695, 42699, 2800/50, 42906, 3922, 44193, 4792, 44924, 4957, 44979/98, 45008/11/49, 45119/20/25/56/61/76, 45213/66, 45361, 45459, 5473, 45644/46/93, 45714/15/32, 47540, 14451/83, 54506, 54648, 15139, 55359, 16163/73, 16326/56/70/73, 17240/85, 17311, 57372, 57604/19, 17671, 17950. (14451's built-up chimney now removed). | SLS/194911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1938 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5459 Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A) | ||
15/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45459 | ||
05/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Inverness (60A) | ||
25/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Perth South (63A) | ||
22/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
09/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) | ||
30/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
07/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) | ||
14/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45459 | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |