Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3118 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16524 Week
» 69540 Month
» 189067 Year
» 3215920 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5442 |
m/e |
12/1937 |
British Railways |
45442 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1497 |
To Service |
During 12/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/08/1966 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5442 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1497 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45442 |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
25/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (16F) |
|
|
19/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coalville (15E) |
|
|
13/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
27/08/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45442 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|