|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/02/1962 | Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) | Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through £50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1937 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5436 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1491 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) | ||
12/06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45436 | ||
06/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
04/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
03/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) | ||
05/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
21/01/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) | ||
19/08/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) | ||
13/04/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45436 | ||
09/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |