Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 112 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7119 Week
» 13253 Month
» 241137 Year
» 1462702 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5435 m/e 11/1937
BR 45435 w/e 19/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1490
To Service During 11/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/06/1968
Scrapping During 10/1968
Service Life 30 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1937
23C Southport 01/01/1948
25X   8w/e 14/06/1952
25F Low Moor 4w/e 13/08/1955
25A Wakefield 4w/e 05/11/1955
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 08/09/1956
10J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 15/01/1966
10A Carnforth w/e 23/04/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 29/06/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25A Wakefield 4w/e 17/05/1952
LOAN 25F Low Moor 4w/e 21/05/1955
EXLOAN 25A Wakefield 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 08/09/1956
ALLOC 10J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 05/02/1966
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 07/05/1966
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 29/06/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/06/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. SLS/196108
23/07/1961 Crewe Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D110-2, 42121, 42235, 42579, 42658/9/77, 44987, 45224, 45415/35, 45588, 49395. Outside Paint Shop: D108/13-5, 45658. Works Sidings: 40580, 42377, 42481, 42507, 42602, 44148/75, 44728/66/79, 44824, 44929/49, 45005, 45247, 45445, 45516/44, 45610/30, 46110/35, 47277, 48154, 49049, 90194, 90323, 90621, 92096. Erecting Shop: D116-21, D269, 41229/68, 42158, 42218, 42562/89, 42610, 44374, 44658/85/6, 44821/71/88, 45045/75, 45104/85/99, 45218/48/54/96, 45333/45/73, 45529/89, 45611/8/9/61/72, 46102/31/55, 46243, 46441, 48287, 48393, 48446, 48697, 48732/61/7, 90264, 90327/81, 90646/58, 92030/2/72/7. Outside Erecting Shop: 42086, 42234, 42652, 44687, 45189, 45410, 46142. New Erecting Shop: D76, D122-8, D331, D5142. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5078. Scrap Yard: 43268, 43962, 47418, 58305 intact, 41529 just cut up. Works Shunters: 12071, 42984, 43957, 47618, 51412/44/6, 52093, 52312, 52441/59. SLS/196109
27/06/1965 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: D1859/60/1, D1962-7, D202/11/32/4/95, D338/50/2, D1508/12/18/29/30/43/54/68, D5709/15, D8015/24, 44669/963, 45018/227/435/93, 48012/111/67/271/322/445/93/507/51/727, 70035/54, 92011/49/50/137/234. Electric shop: E3059/78/80/2/3, E26000. New Diesel shop: D222, D284, D290, D396, D1501/15/61, D1633. Paint shop: D1853/5-8, E3038/87, E26045, D8021, 71000 (stored outside). Traverser Area: 44679, 45327, 48116/768, D240, D1511/21, E3072. Side of Works: 44673/8/877/5004/190, 48474, 92021/212, 70023. Ex-Works: D248, D342, D1615/35/88, D6885, 44759, 45200, 45444/8, 48055, 70039, 92054/247. New diesel shop is the old 'cutting up' shop which has been converted into a light diesel repair shop. SLS/196508

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5435
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1490
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
19/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45435    
14/06/1952 Allocation      
13/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
08/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
15/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (10J)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
29/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 45435    

prev prev