|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/11/1942 | Scottish sightings | The 9 a.m. local Dundee-Perth on 28/11/42 was worked by 5443, recently transferred to 29A. On the same day 2-8-0 8315 visited Dundee. On 30/11, 5429 worked 4.25 p.m. Edinburgh-Perth via Stirling (shed not visible). | SLS/194302 |
15/11/1963 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: 45494, 49395, D1031/72, 27004 and three Brush Type 4s (D1500 series). Paint Shop Yard: 44677, 45059, 45574, 48094/371/502/760, 73135, 75000, 82000, 92008, D221/49, D1030. Yard: 42668, 44500, 44676/86/762/892/904, 45139/263/280/317/736, 46119/43, 46227/31/2, 46452, 48411, 70025, 78028/62, 84013, 90630, 92068/81/178. Electric Loco. Shop: E3019, 26005/16/20, 27001/2. Outside Erecting Shop: 44696, 44726, 45072/137, 46489, 78013, 92071/109, D200/6/15, D374/81/95. Erecting Shop: 44671/712/33/59/858/927, 45013/25/106/293/403/29/34/7/91, 46434/7, 48472/725/31, 70045, 77002, 78033/55, 80105, 92013/153/68/74/82/234, D222/8/9/31/3/45/52/93/7, D303, D6769, D8001. Cut-up Shop: remains of 46158 remains. Locos. cut up at Crewe w/e 19/10: 42556/853, 45100/315, 46223, 49104; w/e 26/10-42238/79, 46224, 49408, 84012; w/e 2/11-45625/45, 46149/222/42; w/e 9/11-42157/288/319, 44309, 45521, 45706; w/e 16/11-42442, 45591, 46126/58/230/49. New construction comprised Brush Type 4s (D1500s), Western Type 4s (D1000s). | SLS/196312 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1937 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5429 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1484 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
19/02/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45429 | ||
28/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
02/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) | ||
16/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
25/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
21/04/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
26/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) | ||
09/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bangor (6H) | ||
18/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) | ||
17/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bangor (6H) | ||
16/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
19/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
22/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) | ||
07/08/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45429 | ||
01/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |