Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1396 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14802 Week
» 67818 Month
» 187345 Year
» 3214198 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5418 |
m/e |
10/1937 |
British Railways |
45418 |
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1473 |
To Service |
During 10/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/02/1966 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1966 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
3E |
Monument Lane |
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
3D |
Aston |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
02/03/1963 |
ALLOC |
5A |
Crewe North |
5w/e |
11/07/1964 |
ALLOC |
IA |
|
4w/e |
05/12/1964 |
ALLOC |
2D |
Banbury |
4w/e |
09/10/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/02/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/04/1962 |
Crewe South MPD (Waiting Works) |
Waiting Works on 5B: 12009/19, 42677/8, 43681, 44364, 45418, 46144/9, 46205/7/10, 47213, 47547, 48964, 49158, 70016. Ex Works on 5B: 45116, 45225, 46117, 48732. |
SLS/196205 |
06/03/1963 |
Rugby MPD |
Following complaints from drivers, Britannias 70017/22/3/4 have been transferred to Aston in exchange for 45065, 45231, 45418/48. During the bad weather in the winter they were in store and in their place 45599 an 45704 were taken out of store for a short time. |
SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 |
Swadlincote closure |
The closure of the Swadlincote loop to passenger trains applies only to the Woodville Junc.-Woodville section, which may be closed completely. As there are no run-round facilities at Woodville, excursions are unlikely to use other than the Swadlincote Junc.-Swadlincote section. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5418 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1473 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A) |
|
|
26/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
28/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45418 |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
23/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (2D) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45418 |
|
|
09/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|