Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 31 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6007 Week
» 12141 Month
» 240025 Year
» 1461590 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5415 m/e 10/1937
BR 45415 w/e 02/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1470
To Service During 10/1937
Withdrawal During 10/1967
Scrapping During 08/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 30 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1937
23C Southport 01/01/1948
25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 8w/e 14/06/1952
27C Southport 4w/e 04/10/1952
10C Patricroft 8w/e 11/07/1953
27A Bank Hall 8w/e 19/06/1954
24A Accrington 4w/e 05/11/1955
24E Blackpool Central w/e 09/01/1960
9M Bury w/e 19/09/1964
9K Bolton w/e 10/04/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 29A Perth South w/e 21/08/1948
EXLOAN 23C Southport w/e 06/11/1948
LOAN 27C Southport 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 9M Bury 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 9K Bolton 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN 9K Bolton w/e 04/11/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/06/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. SLS/196107
23/07/1961 Crewe Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D110-2, 42121, 42235, 42579, 42658/9/77, 44987, 45224, 45415/35, 45588, 49395. Outside Paint Shop: D108/13-5, 45658. Works Sidings: 40580, 42377, 42481, 42507, 42602, 44148/75, 44728/66/79, 44824, 44929/49, 45005, 45247, 45445, 45516/44, 45610/30, 46110/35, 47277, 48154, 49049, 90194, 90323, 90621, 92096. Erecting Shop: D116-21, D269, 41229/68, 42158, 42218, 42562/89, 42610, 44374, 44658/85/6, 44821/71/88, 45045/75, 45104/85/99, 45218/48/54/96, 45333/45/73, 45529/89, 45611/8/9/61/72, 46102/31/55, 46243, 46441, 48287, 48393, 48446, 48697, 48732/61/7, 90264, 90327/81, 90646/58, 92030/2/72/7. Outside Erecting Shop: 42086, 42234, 42652, 44687, 45189, 45410, 46142. New Erecting Shop: D76, D122-8, D331, D5142. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5078. Scrap Yard: 43268, 43962, 47418, 58305 intact, 41529 just cut up. Works Shunters: 12071, 42984, 43957, 47618, 51412/44/6, 52093, 52312, 52441/59. SLS/196109
03/05/1964 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Awaiting Works at Scrap Yard: 44835, 45064, 48053, 48354, 48717, 70022. Awaiting Scrap at Scrap Yard: 42897, 42922, 48140, 48209. Diesel Erecting Shop: D277, D342, D349, D6843, 26005, 26034, 26048. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: D205, D210, D219, D241, D255, D274, D1582 painted, D1583, D1585 undercoat, D1609, D1610, D1611 shell only, 26047, 27006, 46457. Outside Erecting Shop: D254, 42081, 42410, 45080, 45112, 45217, 48528, 92156, 92177. Erecting Shop: D226, D248, D256, D315, D335, D336, D340, D1591 undercoat, D1592 nearly complete, D1593, D1594, D1595, D1596 motors mounted, D1597, D1598, D1599, D1600, D1601, D1602, D1603, D1604, D1605, D1606, D1607, D1608 shell only, D5719, D6789, D6794, D6884, D8050, 42055, 42085, 42394, 44665, 44873, 44884, 45132, 45147, 45182, 45336, 45354, 45415, 45647, 46436, 48211, 48258, 48313, 48424, 48746, 48749, 48759, 92026, 92030, 92085. Works Yard: 42583, 44662, 44872, 44898, 45000, 45271, 45558, 48070, 48171, 48371, 48462, 48538, 48602, 48613, 48684, 70010, 70024, 70049, 78002, 78007, 78017, 92062, 92102, 92126, 92154, 92166, 92227. Outside Paint Shop: D298, D1584 undercoat, D5717, D6775, D6863, D8002, D8027, 48742. Paint Shop: D1578 painted, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 undercoat, 26028. SLS/196406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5415
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1470
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
02/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45415    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (10C)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (9M)    
10/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45415    

prev prev