Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3101 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16507 Week
» 69523 Month
» 189050 Year
» 3215903 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5407 |
m/e |
09/1937 |
British Railways |
45407 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1462 |
To Service |
During 09/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/08/1968 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5407 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1462 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
20/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45407 |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
07/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
13/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
10/08/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45407 |
|
|