Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 376 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1475 Week
» 7609 Month
» 235493 Year
» 1457058 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5406 m/e 09/1937
BR 45406 w/e 18/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1461
To Service During 09/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/07/1967
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 29 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1937
4A Shrewsbury 01/01/1948
16B Annesley w/e 10/10/1964
16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 23/10/1965
40E Colwick w/e 18/12/1965
8C Speke Junction w/e 28/01/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 08/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 16B Annesley w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 06/11/1965
LOAN 16B Colwick 03/01/1966
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 01/02/1967
WDN   w/e 08/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303
16/12/1963 Crewe Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 49395, D252/8, D1031, D1550/1, D1554-7, 26056. Outside: 44671/86, 45072/139/491, 45736, 46452, 48255/411/632, 70025, 73128, 77002, 78028, D229, D287, D356/74, D1032/3, D1552/3. Weigh House: 45327. Yard: 42355, 44714/919, 45006/19/308/75/406/38, 46142, 46448, 48219/415/8, 78023, 92034/67/90/114, D338. Electric Traction Shop: D202, D8006, 26016, 27002. Erecting Shop: 42076, 44726/856/900/32/58, 45003/280/96/316,, 48128/412/614/48/706, 73127, 78033/64, 84013, 92011/24/81/111/128/59/83, D221, D280/8/9/93/4, D301/14/45/69/85/92, D6758, D8024/67. New Construction: D1034 an D1558-75. Outside: 44676, 46143 and 42441remains. Cut-up Shop: 42785 an 90338. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5406
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1461
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A)    
18/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45406    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16B)    
23/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
18/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
28/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
08/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45406    

prev prev