Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1469 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19272 Week
» 72288 Month
» 191815 Year
» 3218668 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5384 |
m/e |
07/1937 |
British Railways |
45384 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1439 |
To Service |
During 07/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 29/06/1964 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 11 mths , 30 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5384 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1439 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45384 |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
06/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stranraer (67F) |
|
|
29/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45384 |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon |
|
|