Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1575 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19378 Week
» 72394 Month
» 191921 Year
» 3218774 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5377 |
m/e |
06/1937 |
British Railways |
45377 |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1432 |
To Service |
During 06/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/12/1967 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1968 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
24F |
Fleetwood |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
ALLOC |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
5w/e |
02/07/1960 |
ALLOC |
9M |
Bury |
3w/e |
03/10/1964 |
ALLOC |
9K |
Bolton |
2w/e |
10/04/1965 |
WDN |
9K |
Bolton |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5377 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1432 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45377 |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (9M) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
09/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45377 |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|