Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 209 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7216 Week
» 13350 Month
» 241234 Year
» 1462799 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5375 m/e 06/1937
BR 45375 w/e 12/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1430
To Service During 06/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/01/1968
Scrapping During 07/1968 at Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 30 yrs, 7 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1937
2A Rugby 01/01/1948
1A Willesden 4w/e 06/10/1956
2A Rugby w/e 29/10/1960
1A Willesden w/e 19/11/1960
8C Speke Junction w/e 14/01/1961
5D Stoke w/e 05/08/1961
8C Speke Junction w/e 19/08/1961
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 22/06/1963
27C Southport w/e 06/07/1963
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 13/02/1965
8B Warrington Dallam w/e 26/06/1965
8A Edge Hill w/e 07/10/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 27/01/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2A Rugby w/e 03/01/1948
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 2A Rugby 5w/e 29/10/1960
ALLOC 1A Willesden 5w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 02/09/1961
ALLOC 27C Southport 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 07/10/1967
WDN 8A Edge Hill w/e 27/01/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1949 Crewe Works Locomotives entering Works during January included Nos. C.D. No. 7, 2236, 2428/46/53/74, 2562/79/80/98, 2624/74/85/86, 4777, 4812/23/68/76, 4965, 5103/6/29/49, 5200/22/84/94, 5317/18/53/54/72/75/83, 5427/49, 5516/24/94/98, 5650/65/84, 5719, 6111/18/22/28/45/46/64, 6204/50, 7181, 7937/51/73/81/85, 8007/80/93/96, 8177/99, 8220/5, 8327/38/45/47, 8417/24/35/42, 8501/2, 8607/28/49, 8705/23/70, 8892/4, 8909/35, 9217/27/90, 9386, 25673, 27591, 27635, 28337, 42150, 42225, 42458, 42589, 42619, 44753/66, 44822/70, 45027/76, 45513/30/65/72/89, 45618/60/85, 45721, 46220/21/29/39, 46603, 48004, 48114, 49307. During the past month new construction accounted for a further six Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E472. They were completed as follows:- Nos. 44729 (7/1), 44730 (12/1), 44731 (17/1), 44732 (24/1), 44733 (28/1) and 44734 (3/2); the last three engines of this order are already in an advanced state of completion. The latest 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0 to be rebuilt is No. 45522-completed on 21/1; at the present time no more are in hand.
Since the cessation of hostilities the former L.M.S.Rly. have fitted several different types of speedometer to certain of their 4-6-0 locomotives. These experiments were carried a stage further last month when during W.E. 22/1 Class '7P' No. 46257 was fitted with a Smiths type speedometer driven from the pony truck axle, the generator being mounted on the left-hand axlebox.
Ex L.N.W. 'Cauliflower' 0-6-0's. Nos. 58409/12 were fitted for snowplough duties during the same week. The equipment includes ex-tended cab roofs, and look-out windows (similar to those seen on many brake vans) mounted on the cab sides.
Since October last, several 'Dean' 0-6-0 pannier tanks have undergone heavy repairs here; those having passed through Works to date include Nos. 2021/67, 2100/09/11/15/27/50/84/85. All have had their numberplates painted red, with the numerals scoured bright. Another ex L. & Y. 0-6-0ST has been added to the stud of Works' shunting locomotives-No. 11444, which now brings the total of ex L. & Y. engines represented to three.
SLS/194903
08/04/1962 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. SLS/196205
16/12/1963 Crewe Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 49395, D252/8, D1031, D1550/1, D1554-7, 26056. Outside: 44671/86, 45072/139/491, 45736, 46452, 48255/411/632, 70025, 73128, 77002, 78028, D229, D287, D356/74, D1032/3, D1552/3. Weigh House: 45327. Yard: 42355, 44714/919, 45006/19/308/75/406/38, 46142, 46448, 48219/415/8, 78023, 92034/67/90/114, D338. Electric Traction Shop: D202, D8006, 26016, 27002. Erecting Shop: 42076, 44726/856/900/32/58, 45003/280/96/316,, 48128/412/614/48/706, 73127, 78033/64, 84013, 92011/24/81/111/128/59/83, D221, D280/8/9/93/4, D301/14/45/69/85/92, D6758, D8024/67. New Construction: D1034 an D1558-75. Outside: 44676, 46143 and 42441remains. Cut-up Shop: 42785 an 90338. SLS/196401
08/05/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: 45025/39/145/198, 45375, 48620, 75016, 92009/110/60, D1100-7, D1557/60, D1709/11/21/2/42/7/52, D203, D253/4, D279, D317/21/5/41, E5016; Paint shop: 45294, 45455, 70010/22, 46235, 71000 stored, D1635, D1996/8/9, D5232, D5709; Electric and adjacent shop: D221, D257, D276, D1507/12, D1844/8, D5196, D5223/9/33, D5243, D7582, E3031/7/42/67, 26021; Old cutting up shop: E3045, D1534/75, D1889, D5704, D8045; Side of Works: 45395, 92048/163, D5702/10; Traverser area: D310/20/37/55/79, D1515/90, D1603/6, D1708/14/8, D1897, D1997, 26048, 92052. SLS/196606

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5375
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1430
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A)    
12/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45375    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
29/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
19/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
05/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
19/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
06/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
13/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
26/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
27/01/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 45375    

prev prev