28/02/1950 |
Inverness Lochgorm Works |
Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 5010, 45160, 45365, 57951 |
SLS/195004 |
31/07/1950 |
St. Rollox Works |
Engines due into Works, July 1950: 40624, 42273, 42879, 44255, 44318, 44796, 45053/87, 45171, 45365, 45560/77, 45730, 15235/60, 55350, 16274, 16331, 17424, 57588, 57608, 17633. |
SLS/195010 |
17/05/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 42125, 42264/5, 44991/4, 45016/214/45/365/472, D3005, D3210, D3544, D5121/9, D6110/33, D8076, D8112, D264. Waiting Works: 44796, 44956, 45478, 45356, 45423, 45471. Ex-Works: 44720, D366. Diesel Test House: D3410. Works Shunters: D3408, D3739, D3904. Stored: 45178, D6100/1/2/6/7/20/4/5/7/30. |
SLS/196304 |
13/06/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) (In Erecting Shop) |
In Erecting Shop: 44705, 45047/53, 45136/78, 45365, 45473, D363, D3341, D3416, D3544, D3926, D5116, D5305/9, D8076. Awaiting works : 42880, 44796, 45423, D5366. Ex Works: 45360. Diesel Test House: D265, D6123. Works Shunters: D2736, D3005, D3279, D8070. Stored : D6100/1/2/6/7/14/7/20/4/5/7/30 and GSWR 0-6-0T (ex Hafod Colliery). |
SLS/196307 |
11/07/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 42124, 42259, 42780, 44705/787, 45365, 45473, D359, D3009, D3533, D3741, D5128, D6124, D8076. Waiting Works: 42196, 42274, 42699, 42735, 44701, 45178. D3563, D5356. Ex-Works: 42736, 45053, D6123. Diesel Test House: D361, D3557. Works Shunters: D3412/6. Stored: GSWR 0-6-0T, D6100/1/2/4/6/7/14/8/20/5/7/30. |
SLS/196308 |