|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1966 | Crewe Works (Waiting Works) | Erecting shop: 44834/856, 45073/212/87/318. 45593 (repaint), 48340/723, 70005/11/40/5, 92013/32/71/90, D238, D249, D275, D296, D315/31/2/78/81, D1508/31/47/9/98, D1692, D1710, D8012 and D1991-1999, D1100; Electric shop: E3014/41/9/67, E26020/43, E27001; 'new' shop: D1533, D1617/36/81, D1754, D1803, D1970. Traverser area: D214, D243/92, D399, D5706/15/6, D8005, D1500/3/41/6/80, D160/83/94. 01700/51/64, D1840; Test area: D243/4, D1527/35/61/82. Old Cutting-up shop: D1515/73, D1788, D8016, E3045, D257. Waiting Works: 45350, 48683, 92020/208. Paint shop: 46235 (inside), D245, D252, D380, D1579, D1985-1990, D5709, 44871, 70051, 92107, 71000 (stored). | SLS/196602 |
27/02/1966 | Crewe South MPD (Ex Works) | Ex Works: 44806, 45350, 48683, 70045; Waiting Works: 44813, 45235/48, 47480/681, 48248, 78034. | SLS/196604 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1937 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5350 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1405 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) | ||
13/08/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45350 | ||
24/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holyhead (7C) | ||
28/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holyhead (7C) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
18/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
11/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
02/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stoke (5D) | ||
11/03/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) | ||
09/12/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) | ||
03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45350 | ||
12/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |