|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/01/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. | SLS/196102 |
12/08/1964 | Crewe South MPD (Ex Works) | On Shed Awaiting Works: 42072/267/436, 44667/738/814, 45716, 48056/220/351/365/450, 92098/157. Ex Works: 45344/85, 48468/516/746, 92104. | SLS/196409 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1937 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5344 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1399 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) | ||
06/11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45344 | ||
25/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
24/03/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) | ||
25/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) | ||
22/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (3A) | ||
08/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
17/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) | ||
16/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
14/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford (5C) | ||
20/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
12/12/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) | ||
02/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C) | ||
20/08/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45344 | ||
03/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |