Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 222 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7229 Week
» 13363 Month
» 241247 Year
» 1462812 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5334 m/e 03/1937
BR 45334 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1389
To Service During 03/1937
Withdrawal During 07/1965
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 28 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1937
23C Southport 01/01/1948
28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 16/06/1951
28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 17/07/1951
64A St Margarets 8w/e 09/09/1951
63A Perth South 8w/e 19/04/1952
68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 17/05/1952
16D Annesley w/e 25/05/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central w/e 16/06/1951
LOAN 64A St Margarets 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 63A Perth South 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 17/05/1952
WDN   m/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 16D Annesley 4w/e 01/06/1963
WDN   w/e 26/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/04/1964 Derby Shed (On Shed) On Shed: 45334 x Wok - Cw, D1730, D1732, 12088, 12095, D3022, D4132, D5265 ex works; On Shed: D1735 undercoat, 42161, 42181, 44042, 44134, 44243, 44909, 45002, 45186, 45253, 47320, 47447, 47461, 48199, 48208, 48391, 48490, 48541, 73139, 78057, 90136, 90078, 90357, 90529, 92022, 60876, 68079. SLS/196406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5334
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1389
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
04/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45334    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 45334    

prev prev