Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1060 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14466 Week
» 67482 Month
» 187009 Year
» 3213862 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5330 |
m/e |
03/1937 |
British Railways |
45330 |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1385 |
To Service |
During 03/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/08/1968 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5330 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1385 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45330 |
|
|
09/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
04/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) |
|
|
11/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
13/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
03/08/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45330 |
|
|
12/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Cargo Fleet |
|
|