04/06/1961 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. |
SLS/196107 |
16/12/1963 |
Crewe Works (Weigh House) |
Paint Shop: 49395, D252/8, D1031, D1550/1, D1554-7, 26056. Outside: 44671/86, 45072/139/491, 45736, 46452, 48255/411/632, 70025, 73128, 77002, 78028, D229, D287, D356/74, D1032/3, D1552/3. Weigh House: 45327. Yard: 42355, 44714/919, 45006/19/308/75/406/38, 46142, 46448, 48219/415/8, 78023, 92034/67/90/114, D338. Electric Traction Shop: D202, D8006, 26016, 27002. Erecting Shop: 42076, 44726/856/900/32/58, 45003/280/96/316,, 48128/412/614/48/706, 73127, 78033/64, 84013, 92011/24/81/111/128/59/83, D221, D280/8/9/93/4, D301/14/45/69/85/92, D6758, D8024/67. New Construction: D1034 an D1558-75. Outside: 44676, 46143 and 42441remains. Cut-up Shop: 42785 an 90338. |
SLS/196401 |
20/09/1964 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. |
SLS/196410 |
24/01/1965 |
Last Steam loco cut at Crewe |
Last locomotive to be cut up at Crewe : 45327. |
SLS/196503 |
21/03/1965 |
Crewe Works (Waiting Works) |
Erecting Shop: D1675-D1681, D1842-D1850, 44685/91, 44717/77, 45347, 45446, 45589, 48151/208/423/557, 70002/9/17/41, 77014, 78028, 92009/76, D5702/3, D8064, D204/20/8/55/68/91, D375/99, D1506/9/16/9/26, D1684/6; Traverser area: D258, D317/28/72, D1521/5/82, D1689, D1717, E27004, 48170/312/615, 92013; Waiting Works: D324, D1517/50, 44800, 44829, 44905, 45006/327, 48077/124/97/364/87/93/433/632/49/66, 70032, 92017; Electric shop: E26015/44, E3011/5/6/20/2/56; Paint shop: D1669/70/1/3/4, D8004/54, E3007, 71000 (Stored); Outside: 44807, 45303, 48470, 48646, 92107, 92133, 92205, D213, D1510/39/76, D8037/49. Also noted: D2708/11/22/41/2/3 an D1734 ex Salop accident. |
SLS/196505 |
27/06/1965 |
Crewe Works (Traverser Area) |
Erecting shop: D1859/60/1, D1962-7, D202/11/32/4/95, D338/50/2, D1508/12/18/29/30/43/54/68, D5709/15, D8015/24, 44669/963, 45018/227/435/93, 48012/111/67/271/322/445/93/507/51/727, 70035/54, 92011/49/50/137/234. Electric shop: E3059/78/80/2/3, E26000. New Diesel shop: D222, D284, D290, D396, D1501/15/61, D1633. Paint shop: D1853/5-8, E3038/87, E26045, D8021, 71000 (stored outside). Traverser Area: 44679, 45327, 48116/768, D240, D1511/21, E3072. Side of Works: 44673/8/877/5004/190, 48474, 92021/212, 70023. Ex-Works: D248, D342, D1615/35/88, D6885, 44759, 45200, 45444/8, 48055, 70039, 92054/247. New diesel shop is the old 'cutting up' shop which has been converted into a light diesel repair shop. |
SLS/196508 |