Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2278 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20081 Week
» 73097 Month
» 192624 Year
» 3219477 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5324 |
m/e |
02/1937 |
British Railways |
45324 |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1379 |
To Service |
During 02/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/08/1967 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
1A |
Willesden |
4w/e |
27/11/1954 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
6w/e |
11/07/1959 |
ALLOC |
1A |
Willesden |
3w/e |
26/09/1959 |
LOAN |
2A |
Rugby |
3w/e |
26/09/1959 |
EXLOAN |
1A |
Willesden |
5w/e |
02/01/1960 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
5w/e |
02/07/1960 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
5w/e |
05/08/1961 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
02/09/1961 |
ALLOC |
5A |
Crewe North |
5w/e |
11/07/1964 |
ALLOC |
2F |
Bescot |
3w/e |
03/10/1964 |
ALLOC |
2D |
Banbury |
5w/e |
08/01/1966 |
ALLOC |
16B |
Colwick |
5w/e |
12/03/1966 |
ALLOC |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
5w/e |
10/09/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/08/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5324 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1379 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D) |
|
|
08/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45324 |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
26/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
05/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
19/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (2D) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (16B) |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45324 |
|
|
12/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|