|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1950 | Inverness Lochgorm Works | Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 45319, 45457. | SLS/195003 |
15/03/1963 | Glasgow St. Rollox (awaiting works) | Erecting Shop: 42261/71, 42912, 44791, 44931, 45127, 45309, D3209, D3346, D3563, D3916, D5121, D5325/30/42, D6102/24, D8098; awaiting works-D3008, D3881, D5348, D6107, 44979, 45319, 45423, 45498. Ex-Works: 45460, D6114. Diesel Test House: D3390, D5309, D5361; stored in paint shop-D6101/6/22/5/7/30. Works shunter: D3412. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1937 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5319 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1374 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Inverness (32A) | ||
15/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45319 | ||
27/08/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Perth South (63A) | ||
21/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) | ||
30/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carstairs (66E) | ||
26/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) | ||
01/05/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45319 | ||
09/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |