Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3975 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17381 Week
» 70397 Month
» 189924 Year
» 3216777 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5311 |
m/e |
02/1937 |
British Railways |
45311 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1366 |
To Service |
During 02/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/10/1966 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5311 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1366 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45311 |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D) |
|
|
29/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45311 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|