Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 4074 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22985 Week
» 87939 Month
» 290603 Year
» 3317456 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5291 |
m/e |
12/1936 |
British Railways |
45291 |
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5291 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1346 Allocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
01/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B) |
|
|
28/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45291 |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
27/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
05/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
26/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
23/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45291 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|