Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19100 Week
» 72116 Month
» 191643 Year
» 3218496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5288 |
m/e |
12/1936 |
British Railways |
45288 |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5288 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1343 Allocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45288 |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
28/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
29/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (2D) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (16B) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45288 from Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|