Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1123 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18926 Week
» 71942 Month
» 191469 Year
» 3218322 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5281 |
m/e |
11/1936 |
British Railways |
45281 |
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5281 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1336 Allocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
30/07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45281 |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
09/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45281 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|