Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1639 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19442 Week
» 72458 Month
» 191985 Year
» 3218838 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5235 |
m/e |
08/1936 |
British Railways |
45235 |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1290 |
To Service |
During 08/1936 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/01/1966 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 5 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/02/1966 |
Crewe South MPD (Waiting Works) |
Ex Works: 44806, 45350, 48683, 70045; Waiting Works: 44813, 45235/48, 47480/681, 48248, 78034. |
SLS/196604 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5235 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1290 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
10/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45235 |
|
|
13/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45235 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|