Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1124 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14530 Week
» 67546 Month
» 187073 Year
» 3213926 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5230 |
m/e |
08/1936 |
British Railways |
45230 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1285 |
To Service |
During 08/1936 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/08/1965 |
Service Life |
29 yrs , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1965 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1936 |
12B |
|
Carlisle Upperby |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
11A |
|
Carnforth |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/08/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
11A |
Carnforth |
w/e |
16/06/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/08/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5230 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1285 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45230 |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
14/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45230 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|