Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 86 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7093 Week
» 13227 Month
» 241111 Year
» 1462676 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5228 m/e 08/1936
BR 45228 w/e 05/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1283
To Service During 08/1936
Withdrawal w/e Sat 18/03/1967
Scrapping During 12/1967
Service Life 30 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1936
23A Bank Hall 01/01/1948
24B Rose Grove 8w/e 16/07/1955
27C Southport 4w/e 08/10/1955
27B Aintree w/e 17/03/1962
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 18/05/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 18/03/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 01/06/1963
WDN   3w/e 04/05/1964
WDN   w/e 18/03/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/03/1961 Crewe Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5228
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1283
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bank Hall (23A)    
05/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45228    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
18/03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45228    

prev prev