Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 94 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6070 Week
» 12204 Month
» 240088 Year
» 1461653 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5218 m/e 11/1935
BR 45218 w/e 03/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1259
To Service During 11/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/04/1966
Scrapping During 07/1966
Service Life 30 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1935
23A Bank Hall 4w/e 22/06/1946
25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 01/01/1948
25G Farnley Junction 2w/e 17/06/1950
25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 07/10/1950
25A Wakefield 4w/e 21/02/1953
25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 04/12/1954
25A Wakefield 4w/e 26/03/1955
27C Southport m/e 16/06/1956
12C Carlisle Canal w/e 12/01/1963
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 22/06/1963
8P Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 14/03/1964
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/04/1964
10F Rose Grove w/e 27/06/1964
10C Fleetwood w/e 19/06/1965
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 18/09/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 16/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 25A Wakefield 4w/e 21/02/1953
LOAN 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 25A Wakefield 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 27C Southport w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 12C Carlisle Canal 4w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 8P Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 04/04/1964
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 5w/e 11/07/1964
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 10C Fleetwood 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   w/e 16/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/04/1954 Wetherby Races, Easter Monday Excursion trains between Leeds City and Wetherby Racecourse station on Easter Monday were well filled and worked by the following J39's from Neville Hill (50B):-64791, 64819/35/86, 64920/22/33/35/43, and also brought in D49 62748 (50B). The excursions from Bradford and Harrogate brought in 62746/58/62 (all 50D), whilst two trains from the Huddersfield area were worked by 45218 (25A) and 42863 (25B). The excursion from Heeley (Sheffield) was, however, worked by 45015 (3B-Bushbury), rather a far cry from Wolverhampton. In addition, the 4.28 p.m. ordinary passenger service from Leeds City to Church Fenton via Wetherby, hauled by 61256 (50B), called specially at Wetherby Racecourse station to pick up. SLS/195406
25/06/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. SLS/196108
23/07/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D110-2, 42121, 42235, 42579, 42658/9/77, 44987, 45224, 45415/35, 45588, 49395. Outside Paint Shop: D108/13-5, 45658. Works Sidings: 40580, 42377, 42481, 42507, 42602, 44148/75, 44728/66/79, 44824, 44929/49, 45005, 45247, 45445, 45516/44, 45610/30, 46110/35, 47277, 48154, 49049, 90194, 90323, 90621, 92096. Erecting Shop: D116-21, D269, 41229/68, 42158, 42218, 42562/89, 42610, 44374, 44658/85/6, 44821/71/88, 45045/75, 45104/85/99, 45218/48/54/96, 45333/45/73, 45529/89, 45611/8/9/61/72, 46102/31/55, 46243, 46441, 48287, 48393, 48446, 48697, 48732/61/7, 90264, 90327/81, 90646/58, 92030/2/72/7. Outside Erecting Shop: 42086, 42234, 42652, 44687, 45189, 45410, 46142. New Erecting Shop: D76, D122-8, D331, D5142. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5078. Scrap Yard: 43268, 43962, 47418, 58305 intact, 41529 just cut up. Works Shunters: 12071, 42984, 43957, 47618, 51412/44/6, 52093, 52312, 52441/59. SLS/196109
14/08/1963 Crewe Works (Yard) Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1073, D1550-58 UC (in various stages), D202/24/32/36/87, D316, 46230, 46442, 44812/96, 44936, 45070/94, 45310/40, 45421/31, 48121/64, 48766, 70018/50, 73166, 90384, 92014/56/83/105/113/133/154/167/173/191. Outside Erecting Shop: 44674, 45414/51, 48409, 82038, 12134/240. Stripped down in Yard: 92084/132/151/162. Dismantling Shed: 49448, 64791, 64907, 90095. On Scrap Road: 63808/17/65. Yard: D215/98, D338/344, 42151, 44826/909/81, 45218/305/398, 48035/133/296/751/770, 70004/21, 73025, 75000, 84012, 92100. Electric and Diesel Shop: 26057, 27002/4. Paint Shop: D1069/70/71/72, 45295, 45573, 49395, 26010, 1439 and Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D227/90, D335/79, D8007/21, 45283, 48502/618/709, 70020, 92020/40/86/123/192. On 21st July, Royal Scot 46151 was in the dismantling shed being broken-up, and 46152 was in the erecting shop having a casual. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5218
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1259
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (23A)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
03/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45218    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12C)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
14/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (8P)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
27/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (10C)    
18/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
16/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 45218    

prev prev