27/08/1949 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 579/97, 600, 40901/05, 41142, 42745, 2806/81, 43849, 4009, 4255. 4879, 5012, 45081, 45115/20/53/57/62/63/71/73/78/79, 45359, 45455/58/60/68/86/87, 45560/79/83, 45645, 45729/31, 46107, 54446/58/92/96, 15167, 55187, 15194, 55197, 15200, 16360/66, 17356, 17407, 57465, 17585, 17621. |
SLS/194910 |
18/08/1961 |
Grangemouth MPD (65F) (Stored) |
Stored on 18th August were-45177/8, 57265, 64593, 65306, whilst 55214 was stored some distance from the shed. |
SLS/196109 |
17/05/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) Works (Stored) |
Erecting Shop: 42125, 42264/5, 44991/4, 45016/214/45/365/472, D3005, D3210, D3544, D5121/9, D6110/33, D8076, D8112, D264. Waiting Works: 44796, 44956, 45478, 45356, 45423, 45471. Ex-Works: 44720, D366. Diesel Test House: D3410. Works Shunters: D3408, D3739, D3904. Stored: 45178, D6100/1/2/6/7/20/4/5/7/30. |
SLS/196304 |
13/06/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) (In Erecting Shop) |
In Erecting Shop: 44705, 45047/53, 45136/78, 45365, 45473, D363, D3341, D3416, D3544, D3926, D5116, D5305/9, D8076. Awaiting works : 42880, 44796, 45423, D5366. Ex Works: 45360. Diesel Test House: D265, D6123. Works Shunters: D2736, D3005, D3279, D8070. Stored : D6100/1/2/6/7/14/7/20/4/5/7/30 and GSWR 0-6-0T (ex Hafod Colliery). |
SLS/196307 |
11/07/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) (Waiting Works) |
Erecting Shop: 42124, 42259, 42780, 44705/787, 45365, 45473, D359, D3009, D3533, D3741, D5128, D6124, D8076. Waiting Works: 42196, 42274, 42699, 42735, 44701, 45178. D3563, D5356. Ex-Works: 42736, 45053, D6123. Diesel Test House: D361, D3557. Works Shunters: D3412/6. Stored: GSWR 0-6-0T, D6100/1/2/4/6/7/14/8/20/5/7/30. |
SLS/196308 |