|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1949 | St. Rollox Works | Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 40187, 575, 614, 40670, 40914, 1138, 42416/18, 42751, 42830, 2875, 42912/14, 4011, 4198, 44234, 4881/86/99, 44900/31/77, 45008, 45120/55/60/65/66/70/92, 45423, 5432, 45452/61/89, 45577/84, 45643, 15141/89, 15211/37, 55356, 16162, 16247/75/95, 56359, 17282, 17411, 17554, 57619, 17625/67. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. | SLS/194908 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5165 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1206 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A) | ||
06/11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45165 | ||
21/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) | ||
22/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45165 | ||
11/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |