Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 105 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7112 Week
» 13246 Month
» 241130 Year
» 1462695 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5135 m/e 05/1935
BR 45135 w/e 07/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1176
To Service During 05/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/10/1967
Scrapping During 03/1968
Service Life 32 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1935
10C Patricroft 01/01/1948
4A Bletchley 4w/e 29/12/1951
5B Crewe South 4w/e 08/08/1953
10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 28/11/1953
27C Southport w/e 17/08/1963
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 14/11/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 07/10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 4A Bletchley 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 28/11/1953
LOAN 6J Holyhead 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 27C Southport 5w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 05/12/1964
WDN   w/e 07/10/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/03/1966 Crewe Works (Paint shop) Erecting Shop: 44659, 45132, 46443, 48392, 70038, 75009, 76040, 92002/16/77/123/227, D209, D290/9, D307/9/20, D1100-6, D1554/6/62/5, D1712/31, D1750, D1998/9, D8025. Traverser area: D215/9/34/53/72, D300/35/79, D1507/53/63/95/6, D1601/10, D1720, D1906, 26042, E3041/9, 92093. Old Cutting up shop: D233, D1537, D1859, D5704, E3045. Electric Shop: E3037/67/168, 26013/31. Test Area: D343, D5277, D7568. New shop: D305, D1505/15/24/41, D1617, D5227/31, D7554, E3031. Paint shop: 45135/305, 46235, 70003, 71000, 92026, D1993-7, D5709, D8010, 26034/57. Stored or waiting works: 44890, 45374/99, 45600, 47681, 48555, 48762, 78034. SLS/196605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5135
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1176
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Patricroft (10C)    
07/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45135    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (4A)    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
28/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
17/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
14/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
07/10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45135    

prev prev