|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/03/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shops) | Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5113 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4656 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Holyhead (7C) | ||
08/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45113 | ||
04/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
24/03/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
21/04/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
16/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
03/11/1956 | Allocation | Loaned to Carlisle Upperby (12A) | ||
03/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
03/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
10/08/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) | ||
07/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) | ||
17/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
19/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
28/11/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (1F) | ||
09/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northampton (1H) | ||
27/02/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (1F) | ||
29/05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E) | ||
03/07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45113 | ||
04/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |