Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 463 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18266 Week
» 71282 Month
» 190809 Year
» 3217662 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5111 |
m/e |
06/1935 |
British Railways |
45111 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4654 |
To Service |
During 06/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 28/10/1967 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5111 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4654 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holyhead (7C) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45111 |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E) |
|
|
29/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
31/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
27/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
27/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
04/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45111 |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|