Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 109 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6085 Week
» 12219 Month
» 240103 Year
» 1461668 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5105 m/e 05/1935
BR 45105 w/e 02/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4648
To Service During 05/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/10/1966
Scrapping During 02/1967
Service Life 31 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1935
26A Newton Heath 01/01/1948
27C Southport w/e 28/01/1961
12C Carlisle Canal w/e 26/01/1963
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 22/06/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 29/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27C Southport 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 12C Carlisle Canal 4w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 29/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
24/11/1945 Willesden No. 28786, one of the last survivors of the L.N.W. 19in. goods worked a goods train from Willesden on 24/11/45. This is the first known appearance of one of these engines in London for many years. SLS/194605
06/04/1946 Market Harborough On 6/4/46 the three parts of the 12 noon ex St. Pancras were hauled by 5279 (14B); 5259 (10C); and 5715 (12A), respectively. In the up direction, the 2.40 p.m. ex Leicester was behind 4808 (5A), whilst of the two portions of the 4.50 p.m. ex Leicester (nominally a 19G duty) were worked by 5105 (26A), and 4815 (17A). SLS/194605
08/10/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196111
15/10/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5105
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4648
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A)    
02/07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45105    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
26/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12C)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
29/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 45105    

prev prev