Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 50 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 18961 Week
» 83915 Month
» 286579 Year
» 3313432 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5099 |
m/e |
04/1935 |
British Railways |
45099 |
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4642 |
To Service |
During 04/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/09/1963 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5099 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4642 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45099 |
|
|
09/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
16/09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45099 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|