Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 11 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 5987 Week
» 12121 Month
» 240005 Year
» 1461570 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5083 m/e 03/1935
BR 45083 w/e 20/03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4626
To Service During 03/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/12/1967
Scrapping During 05/1968
Service Life 32 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1935
12A Carlisle Kingmoor 01/01/1948
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 04/08/1962
27C Southport w/e 18/05/1963
9D Newton Heath w/e 20/06/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 16/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/05/1947
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 5w/e 11/07/1964
WDN 9D Newton Heath w/e 16/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/07/1961 St. Rollox Works (Ex-Works) Diesel Erecting Shop: D3132, D3410, D3528, D5300/3/10/1, D6120/37. Works Yard : 42243, 45157, 45489/92, 57328, 57631, D6111. Steam Erecting Shop: 42690/3, 42804, 42913, 44724, 44820/98, 44920/55, 45047, 45118, 45687/96, 45727, 57617. Waiting Works : 42167, 42780, 44722. Ex-Works: D3279, 42882, 44954, 45083, 45126. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5083
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4626
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
20/03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45083    
04/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
16/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45083    

prev prev