Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 79 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7086 Week
» 13220 Month
» 241104 Year
» 1462669 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5077 m/e 03/1935
BR 45077 w/e 29/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4620
To Service During 03/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/08/1965
Scrapping During 03/1966
Service Life 30 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1935
25G Farnley Junction 01/01/1948
25A Wakefield 4w/e 29/12/1951
25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 19/04/1952
25A Wakefield 8w/e 14/06/1952
24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 12/07/1952
27C Southport 4w/e 09/10/1954
24E Blackpool Central 8w/e 16/07/1955
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 01/12/1956
24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 26/01/1957
10C Fleetwood w/e 23/11/1963
10F Rose Grove w/e 05/12/1964
9H Patricroft w/e 13/02/1965
9D Newton Heath w/e 19/06/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 14/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 25A Wakefield 4w/e 29/12/1951
LOAN 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 25A Wakefield 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 12/07/1952
LOAN 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 13/06/1953
EXLOAN 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 16/07/1955
LOAN 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 01/12/1956
EXLOAN 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 10C Fleetwood 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 4w/e 05/12/1964
ALLOC 9H Patricroft 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 4w/e 10/07/1965
WDN   w/e 14/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/10/1961 Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5077
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4620
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Farnley Junction (25G)    
29/04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 45077    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
01/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
26/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (10C)    
05/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
13/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
14/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 45077    

prev prev