Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 200 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18003 Week
» 71019 Month
» 190546 Year
» 3217399 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5065 |
m/e |
12/1935 |
British Railways |
45065 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/03/1963 |
Rugby MPD |
Following complaints from drivers, Britannias 70017/22/3/4 have been transferred to Aston in exchange for 45065, 45231, 45418/48. During the bad weather in the winter they were in store and in their place 45599 an 45704 were taken out of store for a short time. |
SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 |
Swadlincote closure |
The closure of the Swadlincote loop to passenger trains applies only to the Woodville Junc.-Woodville section, which may be closed completely. As there are no run-round facilities at Woodville, excursions are unlikely to use other than the Swadlincote Junc.-Swadlincote section. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5065 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4610 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45065 |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
23/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
30/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
17/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
29/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
05/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45065 from Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
09/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|