Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1133 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 5948 Week
» 12082 Month
» 239966 Year
» 1461531 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5061 m/e 12/1935
BR 45061 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4606
To Service During 12/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 18/11/1967 off Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)
Scrapping During 03/1968
Service Life 31 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1935
23C Southport 01/01/1948
28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 24/03/1951
27C Southport 4w/e 19/05/1951
28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 16/06/1951
24A Accrington 4w/e 26/01/1952
24B Rose Grove 4w/e 06/09/1952
24E Blackpool Central 8w/e 11/07/1953
27C Southport 4w/e 09/10/1954
27B Aintree w/e 17/03/1962
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 18/05/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 18/11/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 11/10/1947
LOAN 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 08/07/1950
EXLOAN 27C Southport w/e 05/08/1950
LOAN 28A Blackpool Central w/e 10/03/1951
EXLOAN 27C Southport w/e 28/04/1951
LOAN 28A Blackpool Central w/e 09/06/1951
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central w/e 30/06/1951
LOAN 27C Southport w/e 27/10/1951
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 06/09/1952
LOAN 91S To Southern Region w/e 23/05/1953
LOAN 70A Nine Elms 9w/e 26/05/1953
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 11/07/1953
EXLOAN 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 01/06/1963
WDN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 18/11/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/03/1953 Merchant Navy problems - \"foreign\" locos drafted in The temporary withdrawal of the 'Merchant Navy' engines for special examination, has led to the drafting of a number of strangers from other regions. Several V2 have been seen, among them 60829 an 60893; also the following Bl, Nos. 61133, 61192, 61354. From the L.M.R. come 45061, 45130 (latter seen passing Basingstoke on 30th May), and from W.R. at least, 70017 an 70024. There are certainly others, but at the time of going to press, no official notes have given details. SLS/195306

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5061
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4606
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
01/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45061    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
06/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
18/11/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45061 from Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    

prev prev