31/08/1948 |
St. Rollox Works |
Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows:-*40636(4341) 15/7; 40665(3804) 30/6; 40920(3256) 14/6; 40921(4267) 17/6; 41146(3795) 14/7; 41147(3792) 10/6; 41149(4166) 3/6; 41177(3340) 18/6; 41183(3530) 9/7; 42204 26/6; 42215 1/7; 42699 11/6; 42745(4171) 3/8; 42805(4015) 24/6; 42884(4212) 25/5; 42908(4263) 3/6; *42912(4274) 15/7; 43884(2977) 4/7; 44008(3098) 1/7; 44016(3105) 14/7; 44877(10502) 8/7; 44880(10505) 20/6; 44952(10577) 13/7; 44958(10583) 15/6; 44970(10595) 4/7; 44974(10599) 17/6; 45008(9845) 15/7; 45022(9511) 2/7; 45053(9032) 11/6; *45084(9116) 8/7; 45085(9266) 9/7; 45086(9180) 18/6; 45090(9821) 30/6; 45125(9229) 6/7; 45126(9720) 24/6; 45162(9714) 14/7; 45226(9502) 16/6; 45363(9211) 11/7; 45467(9176) 31/5; 45472(9679) 7/6; 45475(9070) 29/6; 45490(9120) 20/6; 45576(9022) 14/6; 45645(9818) 31/5; 45729(9723) 3/6; 47536 22/6; 54491(6191) 3/6; 54506(6212) 11/7; 55126 26/6; 55191 13/6; 55196 15/7; 55219 6/8; 55228 6/7; 55232 8/6; 55240 8/7; 55263 9/7; 55360 22/6; 56269 6/6; 56279 11/6; 56315 23/6; 56327 5/8; 56341 10/6; 56346 15/6; 57245(6058) 5/7; 57264(937) 16/6; 57323(957) 14/7; 57332(6038) 29/6; 57338(1764) 2/8; 57358(1723) 21/6; 57397(1292) 6/7; 57430(6021) 24/6; 57467(1304) 4/8; 57583(1664) 2/7; *57619(1777) 30/6; 57632(1713) 11/7; 57635(1683) 18/6; 57659(1761) 11/6; 57661(1775) 18/6; *57686(1767) 13/7; 57690(1771) 4/6. *Retains L.M.S. on tender. In addition, No. M5359 was re-numbered 45359 on 13/7, tender No. 9060. Locomotives on Works at commencement of Annual Holiday, 16/7. Erecting Shop: Nos. 908, 1136, 2745, 4234/81, 5047, 5455/57/74/99, 5560, 14464/73, 14639, 15164, 15219, 16327, 17337/38, 17453/67, 17599. Yard: No. 16025 (Works' shunter, awaiting shop repairs).Dump: Nos. 905, M5575, 14448, 14649 (all awaiting shop repairs), 15116 (minus boiler; withdrawn W/E 29/5), 17374 (withdrawn W/E 22/5) and 17422 (minus boiler; agreed for breaking up 7/6). No. 16025 , the Works' 'pug,' burst a tube on 12/7 and No. 17254 (31A) was used as a substitute until the commencement of the Works' Annual Holiday. No. 16025 went into shops for a service repair on 2/8; No. 16030 (31E) having arrived to act as Works' shunter. No. 15116 was towed into the shops ex dump on 2/8 and was cut-up during the ensuing week |
SLS/194809 |
31/10/1948 |
St. Rollox Works |
No. 54767 Clan Mackinnon and a 'Wick & Lybster' tank No. 15053 arrived at the Works on 12/10 and 19/10 respectively, both for attention to their boilers; 15053 still retains the H.R. building plates. Locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here during October 1948 (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) were as follows; - with 8' numerals and 10' 'British Railways' Nos. 40598 (3810) 12; 45017 (9530) 10; 45163 (9267) 26; 45309 (9719) 20; 45364 (9185) 4; 45463 (9725) 18; 45481 (9281) 31; 45485 (9831) 4; 45489 (9269) 7; 45583 (9030) 14; 45728 (9025) 22; - with 8' numerals and 8' 'British Railways' Nos. 41128 29; 42746 (4345) 13; 42832 (4167) 22; 42836 (4213) 20; 43883 (2976) 13; 43996 (3085) 27; 54457 (6041) 27; 54505 (6039) 15; 57344 (6014) 20; 57456 (1343) 25; 57697 (1873) 12; 57955 31; - with 8' numerals and 6' 'British Railways' Nos. 40150 15; 40185 28; 42209 31; 42400 6; 55124 11; 56169 13; - with 10' numerals and 10' 'British Railways' No. 54496 (6210) 13; - with 8' numerals and retaining L.M.S. on the tender No. 45053 (9127) 18. Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock and treated with a full paint schedule (tender number in brackets, followed by date to Varnish Shop) were as follows:-Nos. 57435 (1308) 30/9; 57581 (1662) 1/10; 56256 4/10; 56237 6/10; 57575 (6049) 11/10; 57622 (1703) 8/10; 56262 11/10; *55223 21/10; 57638 26/10; 57653 30/10; 56165 5/11. *Fully lined, as also was No. 55233, which was referred to last month. |
SLS/194812 |
09/07/1949 |
Inverness Lochgorm Works |
Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 4785, 45053, 45471. |
SLS/194908 |
31/12/1949 |
Inverness Lochgorm Works |
Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 4922, 45053/98, 16010. |
SLS/195002 |
31/07/1950 |
St. Rollox Works |
Engines due into Works, July 1950: 40624, 42273, 42879, 44255, 44318, 44796, 45053/87, 45171, 45365, 45560/77, 45730, 15235/60, 55350, 16274, 16331, 17424, 57588, 57608, 17633. |
SLS/195010 |
13/06/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) (In Erecting Shop) |
In Erecting Shop: 44705, 45047/53, 45136/78, 45365, 45473, D363, D3341, D3416, D3544, D3926, D5116, D5305/9, D8076. Awaiting works : 42880, 44796, 45423, D5366. Ex Works: 45360. Diesel Test House: D265, D6123. Works Shunters: D2736, D3005, D3279, D8070. Stored : D6100/1/2/6/7/14/7/20/4/5/7/30 and GSWR 0-6-0T (ex Hafod Colliery). |
SLS/196307 |
11/07/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) (Ex-Works) |
Erecting Shop: 42124, 42259, 42780, 44705/787, 45365, 45473, D359, D3009, D3533, D3741, D5128, D6124, D8076. Waiting Works: 42196, 42274, 42699, 42735, 44701, 45178. D3563, D5356. Ex-Works: 42736, 45053, D6123. Diesel Test House: D361, D3557. Works Shunters: D3412/6. Stored: GSWR 0-6-0T, D6100/1/2/4/6/7/14/8/20/5/7/30. |
SLS/196308 |