Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4176 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17582 Week
» 70598 Month
» 190125 Year
» 3216978 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5050 |
m/e |
11/1935 |
British Railways |
45050 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4595 |
To Service |
During 11/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/08/1967 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5050 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4595 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45050 |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
23/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45050 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|