Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 327 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14370 Week
» 79324 Month
» 281988 Year
» 3308841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5040 |
m/e |
10/1935 |
British Railways |
45040 |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4585 |
To Service |
During 10/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/07/1967 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 9 mths , 22 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5040 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4585 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45040 |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
22/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45040 |
|
|
08/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|