|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. | SLS/196202 |
01/05/1965 | Cowlairs Works (Erecting shop) | Erecting shop: 42138/693, 44727/92, 44845/949/91/7, 45034/54/115/82/390, 76050, 73053/100, 80122, 90199; Outside: 45012/28, 45403/51, 73151, 76024. | SLS/196506 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1934 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5034 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4579 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A) | ||
24/04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45034 | ||
27/02/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
16/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (3D) | ||
03/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) | ||
29/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
26/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
10/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) | ||
09/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
20/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) | ||
11/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
03/02/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45034 | ||
05/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |