Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 47 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6023 Week
» 12157 Month
» 240041 Year
» 1461606 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5017 m/e 05/1935
BR 45017 w/e 16/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 233
To Service During 05/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/08/1968
Scrapping During 04/1969
Service Life 33 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1935
12A Carlisle Kingmoor 01/01/1948
2A Rugby 4w/e 24/02/1951
8A Edge Hill 4w/e 24/03/1951
11A Carnforth 4w/e 11/08/1951
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/05/1959
27C Southport w/e 20/07/1963
9D Newton Heath w/e 20/06/1964
9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 14/11/1964
10A Carnforth w/e 21/08/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 10/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 8A Edge Hill w/e 23/04/1949
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC 2A Rugby m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 24/03/1951
ALLOC 11A Carnforth w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 02/05/1959
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 05/12/1964
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 5w/e 11/09/1965
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 10/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1948 St. Rollox Works No. 54767 Clan Mackinnon and a 'Wick & Lybster' tank No. 15053 arrived at the Works on 12/10 and 19/10 respectively, both for attention to their boilers; 15053 still retains the H.R. building plates. Locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here during October 1948 (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) were as follows; - with 8' numerals and 10' 'British Railways' Nos. 40598 (3810) 12; 45017 (9530) 10; 45163 (9267) 26; 45309 (9719) 20; 45364 (9185) 4; 45463 (9725) 18; 45481 (9281) 31; 45485 (9831) 4; 45489 (9269) 7; 45583 (9030) 14; 45728 (9025) 22; - with 8' numerals and 8' 'British Railways' Nos. 41128 29; 42746 (4345) 13; 42832 (4167) 22; 42836 (4213) 20; 43883 (2976) 13; 43996 (3085) 27; 54457 (6041) 27; 54505 (6039) 15; 57344 (6014) 20; 57456 (1343) 25; 57697 (1873) 12; 57955 31; - with 8' numerals and 6' 'British Railways' Nos. 40150 15; 40185 28; 42209 31; 42400 6; 55124 11; 56169 13; - with 10' numerals and 10' 'British Railways' No. 54496 (6210) 13; - with 8' numerals and retaining L.M.S. on the tender No. 45053 (9127) 18. Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock and treated with a full paint schedule (tender number in brackets, followed by date to Varnish Shop) were as follows:-Nos. 57435 (1308) 30/9; 57581 (1662) 1/10; 56256 4/10; 56237 6/10; 57575 (6049) 11/10; 57622 (1703) 8/10; 56262 11/10; *55223 21/10; 57638 26/10; 57653 30/10; 56165 5/11. *Fully lined, as also was No. 55233, which was referred to last month. SLS/194812

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5017
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 233
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
16/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45017    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (11A)    
02/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
20/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
14/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
21/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
10/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 45017    

prev prev