Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 925 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14331 Week
» 67347 Month
» 186874 Year
» 3213727 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5010 |
m/e |
04/1935 |
British Railways |
45010 |
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
114 |
Works Number |
226 |
To Service |
During 04/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 29/08/1963 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65A |
Eastfield |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
67A |
Corkerhill |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
67B |
Hurlford |
w/e |
07/04/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/08/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1950 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 572. 40605, 637. 40906. 41147. 42780. 42832. 43849/99, 44783. 4796, 44878/80. 44967. 45010/16/49. 45115/66167/77/79, 45357/58. 45481/91, 45582, 45713/15/16. 14441. 54462/77, 14499, 54504, 55229, 16157, 16266, 16343, 57307/60, 17366. 17459. 17666. 57686. 17691. |
SLS/195004 |
28/02/1950 |
Inverness Lochgorm Works |
Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 5010, 45160, 45365, 57951 |
SLS/195004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5010 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 226 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A) |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45010 |
|
|
11/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
07/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
29/08/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45010 |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|