|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1950 | St. Rollox Works | Engines into shops: 1131, 2276, 3868, 4884, 7168, 16321, 16329, 17278, 17322, 17367, 17634, 40688, 40924, 42217, 42877, 44701, 44886, 44970, 44976, 44992, 44996, 44997, 45009, 45084, 45125, 45162, 45432, 45453, 45461, 45463. 45465, 45564, 45692, 54480, 54484, 54488, 54491, 55126, 56346, 57329, 57456, 57580, 57592, 57625. | SLS/195008 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1947 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4996 Built at Horwich Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - St Rollox (Balornock) (31A) | ||
12/03/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44996 | ||
25/12/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
19/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) | ||
13/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dumfries (67E) | ||
17/04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44996 | ||
07/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |