Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2223 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20026 Week
» 73042 Month
» 192569 Year
» 3219422 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4995 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways |
44995 |
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
183 |
To Service |
During 02/1947 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 29/11/1966 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65A |
Eastfield |
4w/e |
25/12/1954 |
ALLOC |
68B |
Dumfries |
3w/e |
21/01/1956 |
ALLOC |
67A |
Corkerhill |
5w/e |
11/06/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/11/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/11/1962 |
St. Rollox Works (Ex Works Outside) |
In Works : 42801/81, 44786/8, 45361, 45469/88, D3391, D3541/56/60, D3904, D5125/7, D5311/49/57, D6123/4. 42881 is officially withdrawn; D6123 had been damaged by fire and D6124 had its traction motors burnt out. Ex Works Outside : 42793, 44995, D3203, D5324. Diesel Test House : D6110. Waiting Works : D363, D5365, D6118/25/8/31, D8091, D8121. |
SLS/196212 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1947 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4995 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Rollox (Balornock) (31A) |
|
|
19/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44995 |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
21/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dumfries (68B) |
|
|
25/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
29/11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44995 |
|
|
06/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|